The Honourable Robert Broughton Bryce,
P.C.
Clerk of the Privy Council and
Secretary to the Cabinet
January 1st, 1954 to June 30, 1963
Appointed Member of the Queen's Privy Council
April 19, 1984
Robert Broughton Bryce served as Clerk of the Privy Council and Secretary to the Cabinet
from January 1, 1954, to June 30, 1963.
An engineering graduate from the University of Toronto in 1932, Mr. Bryce later studied economics at the universities of
Cambridge and Harvard. He joined the Department of Finance in 1938 and in 1947 was appointed Assistant
Deputy Minister of Finance and Secretary of the Treasury Board. After serving as Clerk of the Privy Council, Mr. Bryce
returned to the Department of Finance as Deputy Minister. In 1970, he joined the Prime Minister’s staff as Economic
Advisor on the Constitution. He was appointed Canadian Executive Director to the International Monetary Fund in 1971
and served as Chairman of the Royal Commission on Corporate Concentration from 1975 to 1977. In 1968, he was appointed
Companion of the Order of Canada for his services to Canada in various important posts of public administration. In
his later years he researched and wrote on the history of the Department of Finance. He passed away on July 30, 1997.
[ Previous ] [ Former Clerks of the Privy Council ] [ Next ]